FRIENDS OF BREDON HILL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1042022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 September 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 January 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 July 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required