Accounts and annual returns THE GREETLAND ACADEMY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1043467
Charity reporting is overdue by 600 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 25 March 2022 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 18 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late Download Open in new window