Accounts and annual returns BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity number: 1044071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window