Accounts and annual returns ST PAUL'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044163
Charity reporting is overdue by 720 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 355 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 355 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 720 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 July 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 November 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 November 2019 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required