FRIENDS OF HOLY ROSARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 01 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 04 December 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 03 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required