Trustees SOMERSET AND DORSET RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1045547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN LACEY | Chair | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ruddick | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Cosgrave | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Barton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Litherland | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Papworth | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Burfitt | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HOWARD JONES | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RONALD BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.