GREENFORD AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1046044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 June 2016 On time Download