Trustees FINE CELL WORK
Charity number: 1049095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Rademaker | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Bedford | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Diment | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola WRIGHT | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIRANDA KENDALL | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||
TABITHA ELWES | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
KIT KEMP | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murray | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Soames | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Robinson | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.