Financial history COMMUNITY COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1049519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £9.92k £10.65k £12.82k £40.21k £33.86k
Total expenditure £6.10k £8.84k £13.07k £27.30k £38.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.42k £3.92k