ROCKINGHAM FOREST TRUST

Charity number: 1050157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.00m £1.23m £1.10m £1.17m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.06m £1.05m £1.18m £1.12m £1.14m
Income from government contracts £96.00k £94.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £70.00k £248.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £18.93k £194.00k £110.72k £198.83k £307.15k
Income - Other trading activities £778.28k £892.82k £909.89k £916.41k £817.68k
Income - Charitable activities £105.63k £141.26k £72.37k £49.33k £48.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47 £1.06k £540 £1.31k £1.45k
Income - Other £99.89k £1.07k £5.60k £100 £3.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £317.87k £294.18k £372.20k £286.58k £380.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds £739.92k £748.88k £809.57k £831.59k £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.38k £0 £11.56k £11.10k £12.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.00k £0 £1.00k £1.00k £760.41k