19th EPPING FOREST SOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required