Trustees NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity number: 1051832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Dingle | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hindle | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Eaves | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Eaves | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Street | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JIMMY NOWAB | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MANN | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|||||
GLEN THRELFALL | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WICK | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUNE WICK | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.