Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN FISHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052985
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 June 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required