BOSLEY BOBKINS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1054290
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 June 2017 On time Download