CHARTERS-ANCASTER COLLEGE (1995)

Charity number: 1054300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 September 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 September 2020 79 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 July 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 July 2019 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 July 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 July 2018 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 14 June 2017 On time Download