Accounts and annual returns THE PRINCESS ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1054745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window