Accounts and annual returns THE DAFFODIL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1055817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required