Accounts and annual returns WEST ACRE ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1057258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 19 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 07 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window