Financial history WEST ACRE ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1057258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £41.63k £36.80k £35.44k £35.78k £246.52k
Total expenditure £67.33k £57.09k £54.88k £75.16k £169.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.99k N/A £8.03k £6.54k £200.40k