Trustees WEST ACRE ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1057258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM GEORGE STEWART SMITH Chair
None on record
Leah Anne Spencer Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Alexander Birkbeck Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
RICHARD PENNINGTON Trustee 28 November 2016
KINGS LYNN FOODBANK
Received: 30 days late
JOSIAH VAVASSEUR YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION FUND
Received: On time
YMCA NORFOLK
Received: On time
Steven Rimmer Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
David Connor Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
MARTIN HICKEY Trustee 23 January 2013
CASTLEACRE PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
ANDREW PETER SMITH Trustee
PENTNEY PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
HENRY BIRKBECK Trustee
None on record
LADY CATRIONA ANN ROMNEY Trustee
None on record
LAURENCE MORLAAS Trustee
None on record
IAN DUPONT Trustee
None on record