Financial history MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1058226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £29.68m £41.42m £32.01m £29.57m £27.82m
Total expenditure £27.46m £29.28m £32.77m £27.14m £27.42m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.01m £20.55m £20.09m £20.50m £19.17m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.08m £11.60m £11.40m £6.88m £8.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £591.77k £9.27m £528.48k £2.19m £465.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £27.20m £29.01m £32.47m £26.87m £27.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £259.47k £272.80k £300.84k £265.85k £294.88k
Expenditure - Governance £277.50k £267.08k £247.66k £245.71k £229.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.72m £1.51m £1.58m £1.49m £934.57k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0