Financial history UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM

Charity number: 1058483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £419.55k £403.43k £263.45k £244.95k £302.19k
Total expenditure £410.06k £388.64k £288.61k £245.01k £272.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £103.75k N/A N/A £9.00k