BARNET ELDERLY ASIANS GROUP

Charity number: 1058647
Charity reporting is up to date (198 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2021 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download