Trustees SHREWSBURY HOUSE
Charity number: 1058694

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy James Lees | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maylin Ware | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barrett | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey O'Loughlin | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS LEO WINKLEY | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cowper | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LADY ERICA HEDLEY | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alan McCarthy | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francine McArdle | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN HALSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.