Dogfen lywodraethu SAT-7 UK TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19/10/2005, 21/10/2009 & 24/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 AUG 2016 as amended on 14 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Company’s objects (“the Objects”) are: [new para] 1. the advancement of the Christian faith; 2. the advancement of education; 3. the advancement of good physical and mental health; 4. the prevention and relief of poverty; 5. the promotion of equality; 6. the promotion of freedom of religion (as set out in Articles 18 of the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and subsequent United Nations convention and declarations) throughout the world by all or any of the following means: a. relieving need among the victims of human rights abuse; b. educating the public about human rights; c. raising awareness of human rights issues; and 7. the advancement of conflict resolution and reconciliation; [new para] as an expression of the Christian faith, in particular (but without limitation) through the production, broadcasting and dissemination of television, film, and other digital media content.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.