LIVERPOOL SEAMEN'S PENSION FUND

Charity number: 218742-15
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 JULY 1966 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 8 DECEMBER 1975 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
PENSIONS TO NEEDY PERSONS OF BRITISH NATIONALITY WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO HAVE RETIRED AFTER SERVING AT SEA IN THE BRITISH MERCHANT NAVY AS CAPTAIN, DECK OFFICER OR SEAMAN FOR NOT LESS THAN 25 YEARS IN SHIPS WHOSE HOME PORT IS LIVERPOOL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 04 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 20 October 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 20 October 2009: Funds transferred to 218742 NAUTILUS WELFARE FUND
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of