Register of Charities - The Charity Commission LIVERPOOL SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE COMMITTEE
Charity number: 221990-1
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1958 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 1958 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 1971, 3 JULY 1973, 8 JULY 1975
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT MORAL WELFARE CASE WORK AND EDUCATIONAL WORK IN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING SUBURBS
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Registration history
- 28 August 1963: Standard registration
- 03 February 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.