RICHMOND CHARITIES ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 200431-7
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 17 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE WITHIN THE LAST FIVE YEARS BEEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AT LEAST 50% OF WHOM MUST HAVE BEEN BROUGHT UP AND INSTRUCTED IN THE PROTESTANT RELIGION, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND (C) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PARTS 2 AND 3 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Registration history
  • 21 June 1990: Standard registration
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of