WILLIAM BARRINGER CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding in the charity trust five almshouses and land bequeathed under the will of William Barringer in 1631; the management and maintenance thereof and the provision of residential accomodation to almspeople eligible under the terms of the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 19 January 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard M J Adams | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Parkinson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary Eadie | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Millington Norton | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PRENTICE PRENTICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.91k | £24.81k | £20.70k | £21.86k | £22.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.45k | £11.77k | £15.76k | £17.65k | £22.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24/01/1911 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/12/1940 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/08/1951 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/12/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/08/2015
Charitable objects
ALMHOUSES FOR OLD PEOPLE OF STEVINGTON AND THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH OF STEVINGTON FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT WHO FROM AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE WHOLLY OR IN PART, UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS, AND WHO IF MEN ARE NOT LESS THAN SIXTY AND IF WOMEN NOT LESS THAN FIFTY YEARS OF AGE, PROVIDED THAT IN THE ABSCENCE OF SUITABLE CANDIDATES OF THE PRESCRIBED AGE, PERSONS OTHERWISE DULY QUALIFIED AND AS NEARLEY UNDER THE AGE AS MAY BE SHALL BE ELIGIBLE.
Area of benefit
STEVINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meeting Farm
West End
Stevington
BEDFORD
MK43 7QU
- Phone:
- 01234 822074
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window