AGE CONCERN, LUTON

Charity number: 200463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £958.86k £976.46k £942.81k £1.19m £875.39k
Total expenditure £916.08k £912.79k £914.66k £910.23k £881.02k
Income from government contracts £125.00k £125.00k N/A £125.00k £125.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £140.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £212.86k £180.79k £186.84k £187.19k £89.72k
Income - Other trading activities £199.98k £187.73k £191.03k £178.78k £68.69k
Income - Charitable activities £520.81k £571.58k £532.70k £808.91k £704.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.12k £15.08k £16.15k £4.04k £919
Income - Other £11.09k £21.28k £16.09k £9.88k £11.28k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £13.99k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £794.94k £782.07k £776.32k £775.28k £794.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £121.14k £130.72k £138.34k £134.95k £86.23k
Expenditure - Governance £6.72k £6.72k £5.22k £5.22k £6.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0