AGE CONCERN, LUTON

Charity number: 200463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAXINE BRAHAM Trustee 10 October 2013 None on record
Derek Anthony Ludlow CBE Trustee 07 February 2019
ACTIVE LUTON Received: On time
ANEEL SHARMA Trustee 02 June 2010 None on record
Dr SIVA PUTHRASINGAM Chair 12 March 2001 None on record
BEVERLEY CREAGH Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record