Accounts and annual returns THE FARRIERS LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200689
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 04 May 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 19 April 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 06 April 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required