Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY

Charity number: 200719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £55.37m £54.99m £53.89m £53.56m £47.09m
Total expenditure £61.81m £55.91m £64.60m £52.58m £63.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £341.69k £925.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.00k £12.00k £2.06m £1.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.18m £2.12m £1.07m £2.04m £1.92m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £8.21m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £46.80m £44.39m £49.88m £46.06m £45.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £140.00k £108.00k £184.00k £257.00k £72.03k
Income - Other £6.26m £158.00k £2.76m £5.20m £0
Income - Legacies £1.30m £1.34m £882.00k £1.75m £1.52m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £633.00k £49.66m £64.34m £52.12m £63.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.18m £493.00k £260.00k £320.00k £285.00k
Expenditure - Governance £63.00k £147.00k £141.00k £2.00m £115.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £570.00k £231.00k £0 £300.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £56.43m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.76m £0 £143.00k £0