CHAGFORD PARISH CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD TRUST

Charity number: 201046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.48k £5.99k £4.90k £2.34k £3.30k
Total expenditure £2.71k £1.38k £1.48k £10.56k £751
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A