Accounts and annual returns KINGSTON ST MARY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201214
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Annual return 06 April 2022 06 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2021 13 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 03 December 2020 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required