SERGEANT'S MESS FUND

Charity number: 245593-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 2 JUNE 1959, 23 JUNE 1972, 24 NOVEMBER 1975 AND 26 JULY 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN THE 4TH (VOLUNTEER) BATTALION THE KING'S OWN ROYAL BORDER REGIMENT, TERRITORIAL AND ARMY VOLUNTEER RESERVE: PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SOR FARS AS INCOME OF ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THAT PURPOSE IT MAY BE APPLIED (I) IN ASSISTING PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE EXISTING UNITS OR IN THE FORMER THE BORDER REGIMENT (AND ESPECIALLY IN THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION THEREOF) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE(II) IN PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS OR MAKING DONATIONS TO HOSPITALS, HOMES OR INSTITUTIONS HAVING AMONGST THEIR OBJECTS THE SUCCOUR IN SICKNESS OR CONVALESCENCE OF OFFICERS OR MEN WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES.
Area of benefit
No information available
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 17 November 1965 : registered
  • 23 October 1998 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available