Accounts and annual returns MARRIOTT'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 536 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required