MARY CARRICK MOORE FOR ST JOHN'S MISSION CHURCH

Charity number: 204678
Removed charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 19TH MAY 1899 WILL PROVED PR 9TH APRIL 1925 SCHEME OF 2ND JULY 1975
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, COBHAM.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 16 July 1962 : registered
  • 14 June 2012 : removed (FUNDS SPENT UP (S.75))
Other names
  • COBHAM HEATH & SMITH FUND (Working name)
  • MARY CARRICK MOORE FUND FOR ST JOHNS (Working name)
  • CARRICK MOORE CHARITY (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations