Financial history BERKSHIRE NURSES AND RELIEF IN SICKNESS TRUST

Charity number: 205274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £73.01k £72.51k £75.67k £59.43k £68.44k
Total expenditure £42.53k £42.36k £34.99k £48.87k £43.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A