Dogfen lywodraethu MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY GROUP OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 OCT 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 6 APR 1963, 12 APR 1980, 28 MAR 1981, 28 MAR 1981, 27 MAR 1982, 14 NOV 1989, 6 MAY 1995, 8 MAR 2003, 15 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 24 OCTOBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY AND ALLIED NEUROMUSCULAR CONDITIONS; TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF CARE AND TREATMENT AND OTHER RELIEF TO THOSE AFFECTED BY MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY AND ALLIED NEUROMUSCULAR CONDITIONS; TO ASSIST THOSE WHO CARE FOR PERSONS AFFECTED BY MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY AND ALLIED NEUROMUSCULAR CONDITIONS; TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PERSONS AFFECTED BY MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY AND ALLIED NEURO MUSCULAR CONDITIONS; TO RAISE THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC ON ANY MATTERS RELATING TO THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.