SCOULOUDI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 205685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 February 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 07 February 2019 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2019 06 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 07 February 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2018 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 07 February 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 07 February 2016 28 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2016 28 June 2016 On time Download