Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BRISTOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.70m £1.33m £1.81m £1.60m £1.88m
Total expenditure £2.08m £2.43m £2.46m £1.85m £1.50m
Income from government contracts £36.65k £30.61k £31.36k £21.16k £30.04k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £93.86k £7.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.17m £862.97k £1.32m £1.40m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities £158.54k £101.95k £136.10k £34.75k £29.26k
Income - Charitable activities £285.19k £279.40k £289.40k £135.75k £133.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £82.86k £89.89k £62.56k £36.02k £40.44k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.05m £743.14k £1.15m £1.01m £1.42m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.19m £2.03m £1.60m £1.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.85k £239.62k £436.68k £254.72k £260.38k
Expenditure - Governance £16.93k £28.30k £39.91k £25.02k £25.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £13.23k £22.21k £20.46k £14.56k £14.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0