Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SUSSEX EAST AND HASTINGS BRANCH

Charity number: 206314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £170.67k £187.88k £396.90k £265.58k £275.92k
Total expenditure £197.29k £233.79k £200.97k £225.68k £210.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k