Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SUSSEX EAST AND HASTINGS BRANCH

Charity number: 206314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY BRISTOW Chair
None on record
Nicki Fisher Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
Karen Packham Trustee 11 June 2018
None on record
Sarah Louise Parsons Trustee 21 September 2016
None on record
Peter Kemp Trustee 21 September 2016
None on record
David John Michael Garrood Trustee 21 September 2016
None on record
Graham Good Trustee 21 September 2016
None on record
ANDREW NASH Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
JUDITH BARKLEY Trustee 14 May 2012
None on record