THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND

Charity number: 206957
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 August 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 14 August 2019 15 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 04 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 05 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 10 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 06 May 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)