THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND

Charity number: 206957
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £268.31k £441.61k £469.55k £542.76k £471.62k
Total expenditure £154.82k £199.45k £110.07k £499.42k £183.59k