THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND

Charity number: 206957
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Most Rev Bernard Longley Chair 06 June 2016
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM Charity reporting is up to date
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE Recently registered
BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER Charity reporting is up to date
MARYVALE INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
NEWMAN UNIVERSITY Charity reporting is up to date
STEVE MCCOY Trustee None on record
Rev Michael Kujacz Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Rev Mark O'Toole Trustee 30 May 2018
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN DEVON Charity reporting is up to date
Rev Paul Charles Farrer Trustee 30 May 2018 None on record
JAMES WHISTON OBE Trustee 01 October 2015
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
SHAW FUND Charity reporting is up to date
JAMES WHITE BEQUEST ICW THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AT THORNABY-ON-TEES Charity reporting is up to date
BLENKINSOP EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
BRUYERE FUND Charity reporting is up to date
CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Rev John Wilson Trustee 21 January 2021
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND Charity reporting is up to date
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
THE DYMPNA CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND Charity reporting is up to date
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Charity reporting is up to date
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
ROBINSON BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE Recently registered
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL Charity reporting is up to date
DUFFY BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
ST JOHN'S SEMINARY CIO Recently registered
CANON TIERNEY TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
HAYNES BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS Charity reporting is up to date
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND Charity reporting is up to date
ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON Charity reporting is up to date
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Charity reporting is up to date
BUTLER TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
REDMOND'S CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
DEPTFORD POOR FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON) Charity reporting is up to date
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN ROTHON MA Trustee
CHURCHES' LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE (CLAS) Charity reporting is up to date
THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE APOSTOLIC NUNCIATURE HOLY SEE-VATICAN EMBASSY Charity reporting is up to date
Father Gary Brassington Trustee 06 June 2015
MISSIO Charity reporting is up to date