CHURCH SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 207236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time Download