THE CHILDREN'S FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 208607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALECIA FORREST-OLIVER Trustee None on record
Margaret Hine Trustee 29 April 2015 None on record
Tom Gormley Trustee 06 February 2019 None on record
CANON JOHN GLOVER DL Chair None on record
Ian Andrew Brazier Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
NICHOLAS ANTHONY HARRISON Trustee None on record
Dr VALERIE WIGFALL Trustee 07 November 2012 None on record
SYLVIA PINNER Trustee 10 July 2012 None on record
DALE WILLIAMS Trustee 23 September 2013 None on record