Accounts and annual returns NORTHAMPTON MENCAP

Charity number: 208974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 19 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 20 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window